Global Patent Index - EP 1059560 A1

EP 1059560 A1 2000-12-13 - Thermographic recording material with improved image tone

Title (en)

Thermographic recording material with improved image tone

Title (de)

Thermographisches Aufzeichnungsmaterial mit verbessertem Bildton

Title (fr)

Matériau thermographique d'enregistrement avec ton de l'image amélioré

Publication

EP 1059560 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201851 A

Priority

  • EP 00201851 A
  • EP 99201792 A

Abstract (en)

A substantially light-insensitive black and white thermographic recording material comprising a thermosensitive element and a support, the thermosensitive element containing at least one substantially light-insensitive organic silver salt, at least one organic reducing agent therefor in thermal working relationship therewith, a binder, at least one stabilizer and optionally an alpha , omega -alkyldicarboxylic acid with a straight chain alkyl group having at least 4 carbon atoms which may be substituted, however neither including 3,5-dihydroxybenzoic acid as acidic reagent nor di-tert-butyl-p-cresol as a sole organic reducing agent, characterized in that the at least one stabilizer is represented by formula (I): R<1>-(O=C)-R<2>-(C=O)-R<3> wherein R<2> is a divalent straight chain saturated hydrocarbon group with 2 or 3 carbon atoms which may be substituted with one or more of =O, =S, =CR<4>R<5>, an alkyl group, a cycloalkyl group, a hydroxy group, a thiol group, a -(C=O)R<6> group or two of the substituents of R<2> may together form a closed non-aromatic carbocyclic or heterocyclic ring; R<4> and R<5> are independently hydrogen or an alkyl, substituted alkyl, hydroxy, thiol, -(C=O)R<7> group or R<4> and R<5> together may form a closed carbocyclic or heterocyclic group; R<1>, R<3>, R<6> and R<7> are independently a hydroxy or -NHR<8> group or R<1> and R<3> together is an oxygen atom forming an anhydride group; R<8> is hydrogen or a hydroxy, alkyl, aryl or -SO2R<9> group; R<9> is an alkyl, substituted alkyl, cycloalkyl, substituted cycloalkyl, heterocyclic, substituted heterocyclic, aryl, substituted aryl, heteroaryl, substituted heteroaryl, an -OR<10>, or a -NR<11>R<12> group; R<10> and R<11> are independently an alkyl, substituted alkyl, cycloalkyl, substituted cycloalkyl, aryl or substituted aryl group; R<12> is hydrogen or an alkyl, substituted alkyl, cycloalkyl, substituted cycloalkyl, aryl or substituted aryl group; and R<11> and R<12> may together form a closed carbocyclic or heterocyclic group; and wherein the concentration of the at least one stablizer and the alpha , omega -alkyldicarboxylic acid, if present, is together at least 20 mol% with respect to the organic silver salts; and a recording process therefor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/498

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/498 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/49809 (2013.01); G03C 1/49845 (2013.01); G03C 1/4989 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059560 A1 20001213

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA HEALTHCARE NV

2007-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA HEALTHCARE NV

2007-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060404

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060404

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010613

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI