Global Patent Index - EP 1059575 A2

EP 1059575 A2 2000-12-13 - Alarm clock and alarm clock simulating indicator

Title (en)

Alarm clock and alarm clock simulating indicator

Title (de)

Weckuhr und Anzeigevorrichtung zum Simulieren einer Weckuhr

Title (fr)

Réveil et dispositif indicateur pour simuler un réveil

Publication

EP 1059575 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00111866 A

Priority

  • JP 19796199 A
  • JP 37552999 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides an analog alarm clock (10) including a dial plate (11) with time positions thereon, and an annular member (12) rotatably fitted around the dial plate (11). The annular member (12) has a front face, which displays thereon an initial position, and a REM sleep period (123) extending around the circumferential periphery of the annular member (12) with the initial position as a starting point in such a manner as to be comparable to the time positions on the dial plate (11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 21/16; G04G 1/00; G04G 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/00 (2006.01); G04B 19/06 (2006.01); G04B 23/02 (2006.01); G04C 21/16 (2006.01); G04G 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 21/16 (2013.01); G04G 13/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059575 A2 20001213; EP 1059575 A3 20010307; JP 2001056385 A 20010227

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI