Global patent index - EP 1059582 A2

EP 1059582 A2 2000-12-13 - Virtual machine system

Title (en)

Virtual machine system

Title (de)

System für virtuelle Maschine

Title (fr)

Système à machine virtuelle

Publication

EP 1059582 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00112037 A

Priority

JP 15676899 A

Abstract (en)

In a virtual machine system for controlling a plurality of operating systems, priority means 13 compares the priority elements stored in storage means 12 in the trigger for determining the next operating system to be executed, and selects a higher-priority operating system, and execution determination means 11 executes the operating. At this time, the higher-priority operating system is selected based on the execution state of each operating system, the execution priority of each operating system, the task priority of each executable task in each operating system, the time slice execution time of each operating system, etc., as the priority elements. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/455; G06F 9/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/46 (2006.01); G06F 9/455 (2006.01); G06F 9/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/4881 (2013.01); G06F 9/45533 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059582 A2 20001213; EP 1059582 A3 20050202; CN 1152305 C 20040602; CN 1276562 A 20001213; JP 2000347883 A 20001215

INPADOC legal status

2006-02-01 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20051206

2005-10-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB NL SE

2005-07-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 06F 9/455 A

2005-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 06F 9/48 B

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI