Global Patent Index - EP 1059619 A3

EP 1059619 A3 2000-12-20 - Device for the visual and machine-assisted validation of value and security documents

Title (en)

Device for the visual and machine-assisted validation of value and security documents

Title (de)

Anordnung zur visuellen und maschinellen Echtheitsüberprüfung von Wert- und Sicherheitsdokumenten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la validation mécanique et visuelle de documents de valeur et de sécurité

Publication

EP 1059619 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00119980 A

Priority

  • DE 19708543 A
  • EP 98914854 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1059619A2] Value and security product, e.g. banknote or ID card, has an embedded security element which has electroluminescent properties and by exciting in an electromagnetic alternating field radiation is emitted. The novelty is that electroluminescent substances (5) are embedded into the printing inks to print the security document (1). Also claimed are: (a) a testing device for testing visually and/or by machine security documents; and (b) production of a security document.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/00; B41M 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2006.01); G07D 7/00 (2006.01); G07D 7/06 (2006.01); G07D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/128 (2013.01); B41M 3/144 (2013.01); G07D 7/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059619 A2 20001213; EP 1059619 A3 20001220; EP 1059619 B1 20030205

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192509 T3

2003-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-05-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-05-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030401499

2003-05-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABACUS PATENTANWAELTE KLOCKE SPAETH BARTH

2003-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807143 P 20030313

2003-03-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0964791 P

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AHLERS, BENEDIKT DR.

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRANZ-BURGHOLZ, ARNIM

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUTMANN, ROLAND DR.

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, WOLFGANG

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAPPE, FRANK

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AHLERS, BENEDIKT DR.

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRANZ-BURGHOLZ, ARNIM

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUTMANN, ROLAND DR.

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, WOLFGANG

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAPPE, FRANK

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07D 7/00 A, 7B 41M 3/14 B

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-12-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 964791

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE