Global Patent Index - EP 1059620 A1

EP 1059620 A1 2000-12-13 - Piezo effect based security feature on valuable or security documents and detection thereof

Title (en)

Piezo effect based security feature on valuable or security documents and detection thereof

Title (de)

Piezo-Effekt-basiertes Sicherheitsmerkmal an Wert- und Sicherheitsdokumenten und dazugehöriges Nachweisverfahren

Title (fr)

Caractéristiques de securité basées sur l'effet piézo pour des documents de valeur ou de securité et leur détection

Publication

EP 1059620 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00110861 A

Priority

DE 19926010 A

Abstract (en)

The security characteristic has security elements (2) with piezo-effect properties mounted in and/or on valuable or security documents (1). The piezo elements can be distributed individually about a document or can be formed into a combination of several elements in a crystal structure. An Independent claim is also included for a method of checking security characteristics.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfingung bezieht sich auf ein Sicherheitsmerkmal für Wert- und Sicherheitsdokumente in der Form eines Piezoeffekt basierenden Grundprinzipes. Es werden dabei physikalische Eigenschaften der Piezoeffekte ausgenuzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/02; G07D 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44F 1/12 (2006.01); G07D 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059620 A1 20001213; EP 1059620 B1 20130220; DE 19926010 A1 20001214; DE 19926010 C2 20030130; US 6659351 B1 20031209

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-03-06 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50016292

- Effective date: 20131121

2014-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20131121

2013-04-18 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50016292

- Effective date: 20130418

2013-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2013-02-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060626

2004-10-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010526

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI