Global Patent Index - EP 1059643 A1

EP 1059643 A1 2000-12-13 - Dielectric composition having an improved gas absorbtion

Title (en)

Dielectric composition having an improved gas absorbtion

Title (de)

Dielektrische Zusammensetzung mit verbesserter Absorbtion von Gas

Title (fr)

Composition dielectrique ayant une absorption de gaz amelioree

Publication

EP 1059643 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401546 A

Priority

  • FR 9907143 A
  • FR 0001880 A

Abstract (en)

A small quantity of polyarylalkane compounds is introduced to improve the gassing properties of the dielectric composition. A dielectric oil mixture comprises 99 - 70% of a mineral oil and 1 - 30% of a polyarylalkane composition selected from :- -compositions (I) consisting of a mixture of products of formula (A) :- -in which n1 and n2 = 0 or 1, containing products(A) such that n1 + n2 = 0 , and products (A) in which n2 = 1 ; and products(B) of formula :- -compositions (II) consisting of a mixture of two products (C) and (D) where :- product (C) is a mixture of isomers of formula :- -in which p1 and p2 = 0, 1 or 2, with p1 + p2 is less than or equal to 3 ; and product (D) is a mixture of isomers of formula :- p<1>1, p<2>1 and p4 = 0, 1 or 2 and p<1>1+p<2>1+p<1>2+p<2>2+ p3+p4+p5 =2 or less -compositions(III) comprising a mixture of two products (A1) and (A2) such that :- (A1) is a mixture of isomers of formula :- -m1 and m2 = 0. 1 or 2, and m1 + m2 is less than or equal to 3 ; (A2) is a mixture of isomers of formula :- -q1 and q2 = 0, 1 or 2 and q1 + q+2 is less than or equal to 3 ; At least one of compounds (A1) and (A2) is an isomer having three benzene nuclei ; and -compositions(IV) comprising two products (A1) and (A2) with the addition of a compound (E1), (E2) or (E3) as follows :- (E1) is a mixture of isomers of formula :- -r<1>1, r<2>1 and R4 = 0, 1 or 2 ; r<1>2, r<2>2, r3, r<1>3 and r5 = 0 or 1 ; and r<1>1 + r<2>1 + r<1>2 + r<2>2 + r3 + r<1>3 + r4 + r5 is less than or equal to 2 ; R1 and R2 = H ; (E2) is an isomer or isomer mixture of formula (E1), save that R1 and R2 are Me and coefficients r are replaced by s of similar significance ; (E3) is an iosomer or isomer mixture of formula(E1) save that R1 and R2 are different and represent H or Me and coefficients r are replaced by t of similar significance ;

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 3/22; C07C 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C08K 5/01 (2006.01); C08L 91/00 (2006.01); C10M 101/02 (2006.01); C10M 111/02 (2006.01); C10M 127/04 (2006.01); C10M 127/06 (2006.01); H01B 3/22 (2006.01); H01B 3/30 (2006.01); C10N 20/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/00 (2006.01); C10N 40/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 3/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059643 A1 20001213; EP 1059643 B1 20030709; AT 244921 T 20030715; CA 2311250 A1 20001207; CA 2311250 C 20071030; CN 1144844 C 20040407; CN 1292402 A 20010425; DE 60003757 D1 20030814; DE 60003757 T2 20040527; DK 1059643 T3 20031103; ES 2203405 T3 20040416; FR 2794567 A1 20001208; JP 2001055596 A 20010227; JP 2004143468 A 20040520; JP 3545993 B2 20040721; KR 100375357 B1 20030308; KR 20010007272 A 20010126; NO 20002877 A 20001208; NO 20002877 D0 20000606; TW I257383 B 20060701; US 6391228 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60003757

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070601

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-01-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-06-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060621

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-16 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060516

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-15 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-12 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ATOFINA

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2203405 T3

2003-12-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-11-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-10-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-09-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003757 P 20030814

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI