Global Patent Index - EP 1059650 A2

EP 1059650 A2 2000-12-13 - Vacuum chamber

Title (en)

Vacuum chamber

Title (de)

Vakuumkammer

Title (fr)

Chambre à vide

Publication

EP 1059650 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111230 A

Priority

  • DE 19926369 A
  • DE 10007907 A

Abstract (en)

The vacuum chamber has at least one ceramic isolating cylinder whose ends are closed with covers, movable and fixed contact parts on movable and fixed contact stems passing through the covers sand a vacuum-tight sealing element permitting movement of the movable contact stem. The covers (16) are bowl-shaped with their thinner free edges (19) soldered to the isolating cylinders with supporting rings (20) between. The sealing element has at least one and pref. two layers joined vacuum-tight at their free ends both together and to the cover or contact stem (15).

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vakuumkammer mit wenigstens einem Isolierzylinder (11) beschrieben, dessen Stirnenden mittels eines Deckels (16) verschlossen ist. Die Vakuumkammer besitzt einen beweglichen Kontaktstengel (15) und ein daran angebrachtes bewegliches Kontaktstück, dem ein entsprechend ausgebildetes festes Kontaktstück gegenübersteht. Zwischen dem einen Deckel und dem beweglichen Kontaktstengel (15) ist ein eine Bewegung des Kontaktstengels (15) zulassendes Abdichtelement (34) vakuumdicht befestigt, welches als Faltenbalg ausgebildet ist. Der Deckel (16) ist dabei napfförmig ausgebildet und mit seinem freien Randende, das einen Abschnitt (19) mit verringerter Wandstärke aufweist, an dem Stirnende des Isolierkörpers (11) befestigt, wobei ein Stützring vorgesehen ist, mit dem im Bereich des Anschlusses des freien Randes des Deckels (16) an den Isolierkörper eine mechanische Verstärkung erzeugt wird. Darüber hinaus ist auch der Faltenbalg ggf. mehrlagig ausgeführt. Diese Vakuumkammer ist in der Lage, bei geeigneter Bemessung des Stützringes und des Deckels sowie des Faltenbalges Drücke bis zu 25 bar auszuhalten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/662 (2006.01); H01H 33/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/662 (2013.01); H01H 33/66207 (2013.01); H01H 33/66261 (2013.01); H01H 2033/66215 (2013.01); H01H 2033/66276 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059650 A2 20001213; EP 1059650 A3 20020731; EP 1059650 B1 20040421; US 6308857 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ABB SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ABB TECHNOLOGY AG, ZUERICH, CH

- Document: DE 50006118

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120601

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080525

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006118 P 20040527

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-01-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB TECHNOLOGY AG

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-04-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030118

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI