Global Patent Index - EP 1059655 A2

EP 1059655 A2 2000-12-13 - Mechanism for maintaining pressure of helium in channels of a palc display panel

Title (en)

Mechanism for maintaining pressure of helium in channels of a palc display panel

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Aufrechthalung des Heliumdrucks in den Kanälen einer Palc-Anzeigetafel

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour maintenir la pression d'hélium dans les canaux d'un panneau d'affichage palc

Publication

EP 1059655 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00303363 A

Priority

US 13215799 P

Abstract (en)

A channel surface of a glass channel substrate for a PALC panel is loaded with helium to a sufficient partial pressure that when the channel substrate is used in a PALC panel with helium as ionizable gas, helium is depleted from the channel at a substantially lower rate than if the channel surface had not been loaded with helium. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 17/26; H01J 17/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/1333 (2006.01); H01J 17/22 (2012.01); H01J 17/26 (2012.01); H01J 17/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 17/485 (2013.01); H01J 17/22 (2013.01); H01J 17/26 (2013.01); H01J 2217/4025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059655 A2 20001213; EP 1059655 A3 20020821; JP 2000347164 A 20001215

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021101

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI