Global patent index - EP 1059657 A2

EP 1059657 A2 2000-12-13 - Isotopic reference material

Title (en)

Isotopic reference material

Title (de)

Isotopenreferenzmaterial

Title (fr)

Matériau de référence isotopique

Publication

EP 1059657 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304683 A

Priority

GB 9913198 A

Abstract (en)

This application relates to a reference material for the calibration of a mass spectrometer for isotopic analysis, the reference material including a filament comprising one or more metals (X) selected from W, Re, Rh, Ir, Pd and Pt and alloys thereof having melting points greater than approximately 1800 DEG C and vapour pressures lower than approximately 10<-6> Torr at 2000 DEG C, the filament having a coating on at least a portion thereof of an intermetallic compound comprising one or more metals (Y) selected from W, Re, Rh, Ir, Pd and Pt and alloys thereof having melting points greater than approximately 1800 DEG C and vapour pressures lower than 10<-6> Torr at approximately 2000 DEG C and one or more metals (Z) selected from the lanthanides and the actinides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 49/04; H01J 49/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 49/0009 (2013.01); H01J 49/049 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059657 A2 20001213; EP 1059657 A3 20040107; GB 9913198 D0 19990804

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-11-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01J 49/04 A

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01J 49/02 B

2003-10-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EUROPEAN COMMUNITY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI