Global patent index - EP 1059693 A1

EP 1059693 A1 2000-12-13 - Data recording device with a sealed removable suspended cartridge

Title (en)

Data recording device with a sealed removable suspended cartridge

Title (de)

Datenaufnahmevorrichtung mit einer hermetischen lösbaren aufgehängten Kassette

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'enregistrement de données à cartouche hermétique, amovible, et suspendue

Publication

EP 1059693 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00201914 A

Priority

FR 9907306 A

Abstract (en)

The hermetically sealed connection has a cartridge (40) with stored digital words inserted into a receptacle section (30). Connection to the receptacle is made via a flexible contact pad (10) on the main receptacle and a connection head (12) on the cartridge, providing hermetic sealing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/24; H01R 12/16; H01R 12/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 23/03 (2006.01); H01R 12/71 (2011.01); H01R 12/83 (2011.01); H01R 13/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/641 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/2421 (2013.01); H01R 12/714 (2013.01); H01R 12/83 (2013.01); H01R 13/641 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059693 A1 20001213; FR 2794564 A1 20001208; FR 2794564 B1 20020208; US 6796813 B1 20040928

INPADOC legal status

2006-09-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060328

2006-02-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010613

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI