Global Patent Index - EP 1059694 A2

EP 1059694 A2 2000-12-13 - Connector for electric controls

Title (en)

Connector for electric controls

Title (de)

Steckverbinder für elektrische Steuerungen

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour des contrôles électriques

Publication

EP 1059694 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111357 A

Priority

DE 29910179 U

Abstract (en)

The plug in connector for electrical control systems has several modules (10,15,17) that latch together with a housing (1). This provides a means of connection with actuators and sensors. Connector pins (5) and test elements (12) are located on one side and pressed metal contacts on the other side.

Abstract (de)

Bei diesem Steckverbinder mit mehrpolig und mehretagig angeordneten Leiteranschlüssen (3, 4), der ein Gehäuse (1) mit mehreren Flächen hat und der insbesondere für elektrische Steuerungen mit der Auswertung und Verarbeitung von Signalen von und zu Aktoren, Initiatoren, Sensoren und dergleichen vorgesehen ist, ist mindestens eine der Flächen (2, 2a, 2b) des Gehäuses (1) und ist zumindest ein Teil der benachbart zu dieser Fläche liegenden Leiteranschlüsse so ausgebildet, daß sowohl elektrisch als auch mechanisch Zusatzmodule eines für den Steckverbinder vorgesehenen speziellen Satzes von Modulen (10, 15, 16, 17, 18) mit unterschiedlichen elektrischen, elektronischen, mechanischen und bezeichnungstechnischen Funktionen angesetzt werden können. Es können auf einfache Weise für den jeweiligen speziellen Einsatzzweck jeweils benötigten Funktionen verwirklicht werden und durch die Möglichkeit durch die Verwirklichung der Zusatzfunktionen am Steckverbinder selbst über diese Zusatzmodule können andere Funktionselemente einer derartigen elektrischen Steuerung teilmäßig deutlich entlastet werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/514; H01R 13/46; H01R 13/66; H01R 13/717

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/514 (2006.01); H01R 13/66 (2006.01); H01R 13/506 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/665 (2013.01); H01R 13/514 (2013.01); H01R 13/506 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910179 U1 20001102; EP 1059694 A2 20001213; EP 1059694 A3 20020403

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20131125

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061103

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/514 A, 7H 01R 13/717 B, 7H 01R 13/46 B, 7H 01R 13/66 B, 7H 04Q 1/14 B

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI