Global Patent Index - EP 1059829 A2

EP 1059829 A2 2000-12-13 - Loudspeaker with a sealing member mounted to the front side and method of manufacturing such a loudspeaker

Title (en)

Loudspeaker with a sealing member mounted to the front side and method of manufacturing such a loudspeaker

Title (de)

Lautsprecher mit einem frontseitig aufgesetzten Dichtelement und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen Lautsprechers

Title (fr)

Haut-parleur avec un joint d'étanchéité monté par l'avant et procédé de fabrication d'un tel haut-parleur

Publication

EP 1059829 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111613 A

Priority

DE 19925944 A

Abstract (en)

The loudspeaker (50) has a sealing element (64) mounted on its front that is in contact with one wall for acoustic sealing with the loudspeaker mounted. The sealing element consists of a thermoplastic elastomer and is moulded in one piece on the front of the loudspeaker. An Independent claim is also included for a method of manufacturing a loudspeaker.

Abstract (de)

Der Lautsprecher weist auf seiner stirnseitigen Front ein aufgespritzes Dichtelement (13; 64) aus thermoplastischen Elastormer auf. Im Vergleich zu den bisher aufgeklebten schaumdichtstreifen zeichnet sich der Lautsprecher nach der Erfindung durch eine einfachere Herstellbarkeit und durch eine bessere akustische Abdichtung sowie eine höhere Temperatur- sowie Luftfeuchtestabilität aus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/02 (2006.01); H04R 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/02 (2013.01); H04R 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059829 A2 20001213; EP 1059829 A3 20030402; EP 1059829 B1 20040811; DE 19925944 A1 20010111; DE 19925944 C2 20011129; US 2004062407 A1 20040401; US 6661902 B1 20031209

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-04-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007346 P 20040916

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04R 1/02 A

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60R 11/02 B

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI