Global Patent Index - EP 1059830 A2

EP 1059830 A2 2000-12-13 - Electrodynamic loudspeaker with a control device for an active vehicle noiceattenuator

Title (en)

Electrodynamic loudspeaker with a control device for an active vehicle noiceattenuator

Title (de)

Elektrodynamischer Lautsprecher insbesondere für einen aktiven Kraftfahrzeug-Schalldämpfer

Title (fr)

Haut-parleur électrodynamic avec un dispositif de réglage pour un attenuateurde bruits d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 1059830 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110585 A

Priority

DE 19922897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1055804A1] The silencer has an exhaust tube (6) with a sound coupling point (5) in its wall, an introduction point for anti sound gener by a loudspeaker, and a resonance channel (4). The channel section (10) containing the coupling point, and a housing chamber nex the channel wall, are separated by a cooling gap (18,22) with cooling air flowing through it. The channel is formed by the inner chamber of a housing (7). The exhaust pipe passes through the housing, and the housing chamber forms the channel section (11) containing the introduction point.

Abstract (de)

Ein elektrodynamischer Lautsprecher mit einem ein Magnetfeld (14) erzeugenden Magneten (3), einer Schwingspule (6) und einer um eine Mittellage schwingenden Membran (2) weist eine Regeleinrichtung auf, mit der eine Mittellagen-Abweichung der Membran (2) mit Hilfe eines Sensors (10) detektierbar und die Schwingspule (6) mit einer der Abweichung entgegenwirkenden Gleichspannung beaufschlagbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/06 (2006.01); H04R 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/002 (2013.01); F01N 1/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055804 A1 20001129; EP 1055804 B1 20030312; EP 1059830 A2 20001213; EP 1059830 A3 20031217

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040204

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04R 3/00 A

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01N 1/06 B

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FAURECIA ABGASTECHNIK GMBH

2001-09-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ELECTRODYNAMIC LOUDSPEAKER WITH A CONTROL DEVICE FOR AN ACTIVE VEHICLE NOICE ATTENUATOR

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI