Global patent index - EP 1059860 A1

EP 1059860 A1 2000-12-20 - ATTACHMENT FOR AN APPARATUS FOR PLUCKING HAIRS FROM HUMAN SKIN

Title (en)

ATTACHMENT FOR AN APPARATUS FOR PLUCKING HAIRS FROM HUMAN SKIN

Title (de)

AUFSATZ FÜR EIN GERÄT ZUM AUSZUPFEN VON HAAREN DER MENSCHLICHEN HAUT

Title (fr)

GARNITURE POUR APPAREIL D'EPILATION DE LA PEAU HUMAINE

Publication

EP 1059860 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910188 A

Priority

  • DE 19809436 A
  • EP 9900704 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19809436A1] The invention relates to an attachment (7) for an apparatus (2) for plucking hair from human skin. Said apparatus (2) comprises a housing (3) for a motor which drives at least one pinching device (5) which rotates about a first axis and plucks out the hairs. The attachment (7) is provided with at least one element (9) which is designed to lower the pain sensation while the hairs are being plucked and comes into contact with the skin before the hairs are plucked.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 26/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 26/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 26/0061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944462A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19809436 A1 19990909; AT 257660 T 20040115; AU 2924499 A 19990920; AU 747922 B2 20020530; EP 1059860 A1 20001220; EP 1059860 B1 20040114; ES 2214016 T3 20040901; HK 1034025 A1 20041119; JP 2002505128 A 20020219; JP 4299459 B2 20090722; MX PA00008455 A 20021213; PL 188597 B1 20050228; PL 342690 A1 20010702; RU 2214779 C2 20031027; TR 200002487 T2 20010821; US 6520970 B1 20030218; WO 9944462 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160205

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160209

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BRAUN G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20140228

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130305

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110203

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100107

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040614

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-11-19 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: GR

- Ref Document Number: 1034025

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2214016

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2004-04-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908307

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2004-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020906

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE