Global Patent Index - EP 1059861 A1

EP 1059861 A1 2000-12-20 - TRANSCUTANEOUS VIBRATORY STIMULATING DEVICE AND USE

Title (en)

TRANSCUTANEOUS VIBRATORY STIMULATING DEVICE AND USE

Title (de)

TRANSKUTANE VIBROSTIMULATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE STIMULATION VIBRATOIRE TRANSCUTANEE ET UTILISATION DE CE DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1059861 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99937858 A

Priority

  • FR 9900481 W
  • FR 9802929 A
  • FR 9810022 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2775591A1] The invention concerns a transcutaneous vibratory stimulating device designed to produce an antalgic effect, comprising a source of pressure-pulsed gas, at least one dispensing nozzle (19). The invention is characterised in that said pressure-pulsed gas jet is directed against a skin surface through said dispensing nozzle (19) at a frequency higher than 50 Hz.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 26/00; A61H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 26/00 (2006.01); A61H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 26/0061 (2013.01); A61H 9/0071 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944463A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2775591 A1 19990910; FR 2775591 B1 20000602; AU 3257899 A 19990920; EP 1059861 A1 20001220; EP 1059861 B1 20020403; ES 2176011 T3 20021116; WO 9944463 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110304

2012-04-23 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120423

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100303

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090330

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2176011 T3

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010711

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT