Global Patent Index - EP 1059884 A1

EP 1059884 A1 2000-12-20 - ROTATING BURR PMR DEVICE AND METHOD

Title (en)

ROTATING BURR PMR DEVICE AND METHOD

Title (de)

PMR-GERÄT MIT ROTIERENDEM BOHRER

Title (fr)

INSTRUMENT POUR REVASCULARISATION MYOCARDIQUE PERCUTANEE A FRAISE ROTATIVE ET TECHNIQUE AFFERENTE

Publication

EP 1059884 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99909887 A

Priority

  • US 9904941 W
  • US 3572998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944516A1] A catheter (10) including an elongate drive shaft (11) having a proximal end and a distal end. An abrasive burr (12) disposed at a distal end of the drive shaft. A stop (22) for limiting the depth of penetration of the burr disposed proximate to and proximal of the abrasive burr.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/22; A61B 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/22 (2006.01); A61B 17/32 (2006.01); A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/320758 (2013.01); A61B 17/32002 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00247 (2013.01); A61B 2017/22082 (2013.01); A61B 2017/320004 (2013.01); A61B 2017/320008 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00392 (2013.01); A61B 2090/036 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944516A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944516 A1 19990910; DE 1059884 T1 20010705; EP 1059884 A1 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051001

2001-07-05 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-03-23 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC LIMITED

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE