Global Patent Index - EP 1059910 A2

EP 1059910 A2 2000-12-20 - AGENTS AND METHOD FOR TREATING KERATINOUS FIBRES

Title (en)

AGENTS AND METHOD FOR TREATING KERATINOUS FIBRES

Title (de)

MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG KERATINISCHER FASERN

Title (fr)

PRODUIT ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE FIBRES KERATINIQUES

Publication

EP 1059910 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99915529 A

Priority

  • DE 19808766 A
  • EP 9901109 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19808766A1] The invention relates to agents containing at least 6 wt. % oil components and at least one non-ionogenic emulsifier. The inventive agents take the form of a microemulsion with an average droplet size of less than 400 nanometers and contain a UV radiation-absorbing component A of general formula (I) U-Q, wherein U represents a UV radiation-absorbing group and Q represents a group containing at least one quarternary ammonium function. These agents are excellently suited to protecting keratinous fibres, especially human hair, against UV radiation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/06; A61K 7/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/06 (2006.01); A61K 8/35 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/40 (2006.01); A61K 8/41 (2006.01); A61K 8/46 (2006.01); A61K 8/92 (2006.01); A61K 8/97 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/06 (2006.01); A61Q 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 17/04 (2013.01); A61K 8/068 (2013.01); A61K 8/35 (2013.01); A61K 8/37 (2013.01); A61K 8/416 (2013.01); A61K 8/466 (2013.01); B82Y 5/00 (2013.01); A61K 2800/413 (2013.01); A61Q 5/06 (2013.01); A61Q 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944564A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19808766 A1 19990909; AU 3408599 A 19990920; AU 754383 B2 20021114; BR 9908432 A 20001031; CA 2322853 A1 19990910; CN 1291881 A 20010418; EP 1059910 A2 20001220; HU 0200829 A2 20020828; JP 2002507547 A 20020312; NZ 507248 A 20020328; PL 349514 A1 20020729; SK 13132000 A3 20010611; TR 200002389 T2 20011121; WO 9944564 A2 19990910; WO 9944564 A3 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060304

2005-12-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

2004-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HANS SCHWARZKOPF & HENKEL GMBH & CO. KG

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040127

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000825