Global Patent Index - EP 1059976 A1

EP 1059976 A1 2000-12-20 - DYNAMICALLY CONTROLLED CRYSTALLIZATION METHOD AND APPARATUS AND CRYSTALS OBTAINED THEREBY

Title (en)

DYNAMICALLY CONTROLLED CRYSTALLIZATION METHOD AND APPARATUS AND CRYSTALS OBTAINED THEREBY

Title (de)

DYNAMISCH KONTROLLIERTES KRISTALLISATIONSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND DAMIT ERZEUGTE KRISTALLE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CRISTALLISATION A COMMANDE DYNAMIQUE ET CRISTAUX OBTENUS AU MOYEN DE CEUX-CI

Publication

EP 1059976 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914879 A

Priority

  • IL 12821699 A
  • US 9903515 W
  • US 2547598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942191A1] A method and apparatus for dynamically controlling the crystallization of molecules including a crystallization chamber (14) or chambers for holding molecules in a precipitant solution, one or more precipitant solution reservoirs (16, 18), communication passages (17, 19) respectively coupling the crystallization chamber(s) with each of the precipitant solution reservoirs, and transfer mechanisms (20, 21, 22, 24, 26, 28) configured to respectively transfer precipitant solution between each of the precipitant solution reservoirs and the crystallization chamber(s). The transfer mechanisms are interlocked to maintain a constant volume of precipitant solution in the crystallization chamber(s). Precipitant solutions of different concentrations are transferred into and out of the crystallization chamber(s) to adjust the concentration of precipitant in the crystallization chamber(s) to achieve precise control of the crystallization process. The method and apparatus can be used effectively to grow crystals under reduced gravity conditions such as microgravity condictions of space, and under conditions of reduced or enhanced effective gravity as induced by a powerful magnetic field.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 9/00; C30B 7/00; C30B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 9/02 (2006.01); B01D 9/00 (2006.01); B01J 19/24 (2006.01); C30B 7/00 (2006.01); C30B 23/00 (2006.01); C30B 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C30B 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IE IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942191 A1 19990826; AU 3352999 A 19990906; EP 1059976 A1 20001220; EP 1059976 A4 20010228; JP 2002503538 A 20020205

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041025

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040614

2003-06-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIOSPACE INTERNATIONAL INC.

2001-02-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IE IT LI SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IE IT LI SE