Global Patent Index - EP 1060032 A2

EP 1060032 A2 2000-12-20 - COATED METAL STRIPS

Title (en)

COATED METAL STRIPS

Title (de)

BESCHICHTUNG VON METALLBÄNDERN

Title (fr)

BANDE METALLIQUE LAMINEE

Publication

EP 1060032 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99937821 A

Priority

  • GB 9900567 W
  • GB 9804297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2334906A] A process for producing laminated metal strip which comprises the steps of chemically treating the strip to form on at least one of its surfaces a non-metallic coating, and applying to that coated surface a coating of a thermoplastic resin to form a layer thereon. The first coating is preferably corrosion resistant and promotes adhesion with the thermoplastic resin. Preferably the non-metallic coating layer is a phosphate, chromate, oxalate, arsenate, a 2 component polymer, a combination of chromium, silicon and an organic active species, or silanes or azoles. Preferably the thermoplastic resin is polypropylene, polyethyleneterephthalate or a mixture thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/10 (2006.01); B05D 7/00 (2006.01); B05D 7/14 (2006.01); B65D 25/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/51 (2013.01); B05D 3/102 (2013.01); B05D 7/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944756A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB LU

EPO simple patent family

GB 2334906 A 19990908; GB 9804297 D0 19980422; AT 218930 T 20020615; AU 3259699 A 19990920; AU 741976 B2 20011213; BR 9908396 A 20001031; CA 2322533 A1 19990910; CN 1291918 A 20010418; DE 69901797 D1 20020718; DE 69901797 T2 20030306; EP 1060032 A2 20001220; EP 1060032 B1 20020612; ES 2178453 T3 20021216; ID 28089 A 20010503; PL 343020 A1 20010730; RU 2003124575 A 20050227; RU 2220789 C2 20040110; WO 9944756 A2 19990910; WO 9944756 A3 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130302

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130302

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080207

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2178453

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69901797

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-18

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB LU

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 218930

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORUS UK LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010829

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB LU