Global Patent Index - EP 1060048 A1

EP 1060048 A1 2000-12-20 - METHOD OF CASTING A METAL MELT IN THE PRESENCE OF A MAGNETIC FIELD

Title (en)

METHOD OF CASTING A METAL MELT IN THE PRESENCE OF A MAGNETIC FIELD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERGIESSEN EINER METALLSCHMELZE UNTER EINWIRKUNG EINES MAGNETFELDES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA COULEE DE METAL FONDU SOUS L'INFLUENCE D'UN CHAMP MAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 1060048 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907603 A

Priority

  • DE 19809631 A
  • EP 9901448 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944773A1] The invention relates to a method for casting a molten mass at a relatively low solidification rate, such as, in particular, gravity chill-cast methods, sand casting methods, low pressure casting methods or intermediate forms of these methods, whereby the molten mass has phases, such as the presettling of crystals, particles or short fibers, having a lower conductibility of electricity than the metal of the remaining molten mass. In order to obtain surface areas which are resistant to wear, the invention provides that the molten mass is solidified by at least the local effect of an electromagnetic alternating field and that, in the course of this, the electromagnetic alternating field penetrates into a surface area with a penetration depth according to the frequency of the alternating field and to the conductibility of the molten mass. As a result, the phases with lower conductibilities are enhanced on these surface areas of the cast part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 27/02; B01F 13/08; B22D 19/14; C22C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 19/14 (2006.01); B22D 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 19/14 (2013.01); B22D 27/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944773A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944773 A1 19990910; DE 19809631 C1 20000330; EP 1060048 A1 20001220; EP 1060048 B1 20040616

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110305

2012-02-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909748

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110305

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100402

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909748 P 20040722

2004-07-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2003-10-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF CASTING A METAL MELT IN THE PRESENCE OF A MAGNETIC FIELD

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011011

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT