Global Patent Index - EP 1060052 A1

EP 1060052 A1 2000-12-20 - DEVICE FOR WORKING A SURFACE, ESPECIALLY A LIFTING PLATFORM, AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A DEVICE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR WORKING A SURFACE, ESPECIALLY A LIFTING PLATFORM, AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEARBEITEN EINER FLÄCHE, INSBESONDERE HUBARBEITSBÜHNE, UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR TRAVAILLER UNE SURFACE, EN PARTICULIER PLATE-FORME DE LEVAGE, ET PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN TEL DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1060052 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913210 A

Priority

  • DE 19808691 A
  • EP 9901344 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19808691A1] The invention relates to a device for working a surface, especially a lifting platform (100), comprising a boom (304) or a platform, a working means (305) which can be placed against the surface to be worked, and a means (318) which is arranged between the boom (304) or the platform and the working means (305) and which provides an application force that acts on said working means (305). The invention is characterized in that the working means (305) is suspended on a suspension (307, 316) such that it can move freely around two axes which preferably form a right angle. The invention is additionally characterized in that the means (318) which provides the application force engages with the suspension (307, 316).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24C 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24C 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24C 3/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944788A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19808691 A1 19990909; CN 1096916 C 20021225; CN 1291930 A 20010418; EP 1060052 A1 20001220; EP 1060052 B1 20020206; ES 2172984 T3 20021001; JP 2002505202 A 20020219; US 6464569 B1 20021015; WO 9944788 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-04-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2010-01-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: JLG INDUSTRIES INC.

- Effective date: 20090923

2008-11-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172984 T3

2002-05-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900829 20020321

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LIFTLUX POTAIN GMBH

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010706

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL