Global Patent Index - EP 1060072 A1

EP 1060072 A1 2000-12-20 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING FILM BAGS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PRODUCING FILM BAGS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON SCHLAUCHBEUTELPACKUNGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DES SACS FERMES D'EMBALLAGE

Publication

EP 1060072 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99966876 A

Priority

  • DE 9904000 W
  • DE 19858567 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19858567A1] The invention relates to a device (10) for producing film bags (1) which comprises a forming tube (21) having a rectangular cross-section. To produce reinforcing seams (3) embodied in extension of the broad lateral walls (4, 7) of the film bag (1) the device (10) has a forming and folding unit (35). The forming and folding unit (35) comprises two forming plates (36, 37) fixed to the forming tube (21) and a folding frame (38) with folding elements (61, 62). The device (10) provided for in the invention has a relatively simple structure and makes it possible to form the reinforcing seams (3) in a way which subjects the bag material to only little stress.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 19/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 19/74 (2006.01); B31B 19/90 (2006.01); B31B 23/00 (2006.01); B31B 23/26 (2006.01); B65B 9/20 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/207 (2013.01); B65B 9/20 (2013.01); B65B 9/2028 (2013.01); B65B 9/2042 (2013.01); B65B 9/213 (2013.01); B65B 61/188 (2013.01); B31B 70/008 (2017.08); B31B 70/8133 (2017.08); B65B 2220/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19858567 A1 20000629; DE 19858567 C2 20020919; AU 2277600 A 20000712; AU 751350 B2 20020815; BR 9908023 A 20001031; EP 1060072 A1 20001220; EP 1060072 B1 20041020; ES 2232200 T3 20050516; JP 2002532303 A 20021002; JP 4410943 B2 20100210; US 6513308 B1 20030204; WO 0037245 A1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 59910900

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B31B0019740000

- IPC: B31B0070740000

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091217

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110316

2011-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110329

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081222

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232200 T3

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050202

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910900 P 20041125

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030311

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001229

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE