Global Patent Index - EP 1060081 A1

EP 1060081 A1 2000-12-20 - INK CONTAINER REFURBISHMENT SYSTEM

Title (en)

INK CONTAINER REFURBISHMENT SYSTEM

Title (de)

TINTENBEHÄLTERNACHFÜLLSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE RECONDITIONNEMENT DE CARTOUCHE D'ENCRE

Publication

EP 1060081 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98922082 A

Priority

  • US 9808886 W
  • US 3471998 A
  • US 5355698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944830A1] Alternative methods for refurbishing a single-use ink delivery container (12) for a printing system are described. The refurbishing methods include electrical and mechanical reconfiguration or replacement of original elements on the ink delivery container. Each method utilises an existing ink fluid outlet (30), electrical connector (54) and an information storage device on the ink delivery container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1755 (2013.01); B41J 2/17506 (2013.01); B41J 2/17509 (2013.01); B41J 2/17513 (2013.01); B41J 2/17546 (2013.01); B41J 2002/17569 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944830A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944830 A1 19990910; CN 1195630 C 20050406; CN 1286659 A 20010307; DE 69808145 D1 20021024; DE 69808145 T2 20030417; DE 69835302 D1 20060831; DE 69835302 T2 20070208; EP 1060081 A1 20001220; EP 1060081 B1 20020918; EP 1201441 A1 20020502; EP 1201441 B1 20060719; ES 2179493 T3 20030116; ES 2263733 T3 20061216; HK 1029775 A1 20030117; JP 2002505212 A 20020219; JP 4210034 B2 20090114

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160511

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160511

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69808145

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120329 AND 20120404

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090512

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090512

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179493 T3

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808145 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB