Global patent index - EP 1060087 A2

EP 1060087 A2 2000-12-20 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TEMPORARY BINDING, AND RING-ELEMENT USED IN SAID SYSTEM

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TEMPORARY BINDING, AND RING-ELEMENT USED IN SAID SYSTEM

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM TEMPORÄREN BINDEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGER RINGORDNERMECHANISMUS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE RELIURE TEMPORAIRE, ET ANNEAU-ELEMENT MIS EN OEUVRE DANS CE SYSTEME

Publication

EP 1060087 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 99907662 A

Priority

  • FR 9900501 W
  • FR 9802639 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2775632A1] The invention concerns a system (S) for temporarily binding elements (100) provided with perforations (P-1, ..., P-N), comprising an assembly of ring elements (10-1, ..., 10-N) each comprising an aperture (1) over their whole width to enable their insertion into the perforations (P-1, ..., P-N) of each of the elements to be bound. Each ring-element (10-1, ..., 10-N) has a permanent aperture (1) corresponding to an absence of material over a predetermined portion of said ring-element, and a shaped section adapted to provide several contact points with the perforation (P-1, ..., P-N) wherein said ring-element is inserted. Said system is particularly adapted for temporarily binding sheets of paper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944839A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2775632 A1 19990910; FR 2775632 B1 20000331; DE 69905345 D1 20030320; DE 69905345 T2 20040219; EP 1060087 A2 20001220; EP 1060087 B1 20030212; WO 9944839 A2 19990910; WO 9944839 A3 19991028

INPADOC legal status

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080304

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080304

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060302

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CHEVALIER GILLES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ASSOCIATION ORKOS-MONTRAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ASSOCIATION RADIO ICI ET MAINTENANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2005-03-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050321

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050304

2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031113

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2003-08-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69905345

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEVALIER, GILLES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASSOCIATION ORKOS-MONTRAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASSOCIATION RADIO ICI ET MAINTENANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020204

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT