Global Patent Index - EP 1060106 A1

EP 1060106 A1 2000-12-20 - CONTAINER WITH A DISCHARGE NOZZLE

Title (en)

CONTAINER WITH A DISCHARGE NOZZLE

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER MIT EINER AUSLASSDÜSE

Title (fr)

CONTENANT DOTE D'UNE BUSE D'EVACUATION

Publication

EP 1060106 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910301 A

Priority

  • DE 19845686 A
  • EP 9901290 W
  • NL 1008487 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944907A1] The inventive container (2) has a sealing cap (15) for the discharge nozzle (1) and a discharge opening (8) which is sealed by a membrane (11). Said discharge nozzle (1) has a discharge body (4, 5) with a discharge channel (3) and a connecting element (6) for connecting the discharge body (4, 5) to the discharge opening (8) of the container (2). An element (10) is provided for piercing the membrane (11) during or after the connection of the discharge body (4, 5) to the discharge opening (8) of the container (2). This element (10) is configured as a part of the discharge body (4, 5). An opened container is therefore much easier to reseal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/226 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0015 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0056 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0096 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944907A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944907 A1 19990910; AU 2930699 A 19990920; AU 742209 B2 20011220; BR 9908570 A 20011218; CA 2322974 A1 19990910; CN 1135195 C 20040121; CN 1292761 A 20010425; EP 1060106 A1 20001220; EP 1060106 B1 20030115; ES 2191420 T3 20030901; JP 2002505236 A 20020219; RU 2236999 C2 20040927; US 6293431 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080227

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080227

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070727

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060317

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060220

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060205

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2191420

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030225

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904041

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020627

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL