Global patent index - EP 1060107 A1

EP 1060107 A1 2000-12-20 - MATERIAL FOR TRAYS OR PACKAGINGS

Title (en)

MATERIAL FOR TRAYS OR PACKAGINGS

Title (de)

VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL, ZUM BEISPIEL FÜR SCHALEN

Title (fr)

MATERIAUX DESTINES A DES PLATEAUX OU A DES EMBALLAGES

Publication

EP 1060107 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99907987 A

Priority

  • SE 9900173 W
  • SE 9800671 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944909A1] Material for trays or packagings, which material is built up from a number of layers, these layers comprising, seen from the inside of the tray/packaging, a first greaseproof paper (2), a layer of adhesive (4) and a second greaseproof paper (5). Applied outside said second greaseproof paper is a water-repellent layer (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 65/46; B32B 29/06; B65D 1/28; D21H 19/72; D21H 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 29/06 (2006.01); D21H 27/10 (2006.01); D21H 11/06 (2006.01); D21H 19/12 (2006.01); D21H 19/18 (2006.01); D21H 19/20 (2006.01); D21H 19/32 (2006.01); D21H 19/34 (2006.01); D21H 19/82 (2006.01); D21H 19/84 (2006.01); D21H 27/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 27/10 (2013.01); B32B 29/06 (2013.01); D21H 11/06 (2013.01); D21H 19/12 (2013.01); D21H 19/18 (2013.01); D21H 19/20 (2013.01); D21H 19/32 (2013.01); D21H 19/34 (2013.01); D21H 19/824 (2013.01); D21H 19/84 (2013.01); D21H 27/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944909A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944909 A1 19990910; AU 2751399 A 19990920; EP 1060107 A1 20001220; SE 511651 C2 19991101; SE 9800671 D0 19980304; SE 9800671 L 19990905

INPADOC legal status

2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050910

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030711

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORDIC PAPER SEFFLE AKTIEBOLAG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE