Global Patent Index - EP 1060118 A1

EP 1060118 A1 2000-12-20 - STRIP GUIDE FOR A DEVICE FOR CONVEYING STRIPS OF MATERIAL OR MATERIAL IN THE FORM OF SHEETS, ESPECIALLY A CORRUGATED BOARD MACHINE

Title (en)

STRIP GUIDE FOR A DEVICE FOR CONVEYING STRIPS OF MATERIAL OR MATERIAL IN THE FORM OF SHEETS, ESPECIALLY A CORRUGATED BOARD MACHINE

Title (de)

BAHNWEICHE FÜR EINE EINRICHTUNG ZUM TRANSPORT VON MATERIALBAHNEN ODER BOGENFÖRMIGEM MATERIAL, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE WELLPAPPENANLAGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SEPARATION POUR DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT DE BANDES DE MATERIAU OU DE MATERIAU SOUS FORME DE FEUILLES, NOTAMMENT POUR INSTALLATION POUR CARTON ONDULE

Publication

EP 1060118 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99911622 A

Priority

  • DE 9900546 W
  • DE 19809267 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19809267A1] The invention relates to a strip guide (13) for a device for conveying strips of material (9) or material in the form of sheets, especially for corrugated board machines, comprising several elements (23) pivotally mounted on an axis (A) transversal to the direction of conveyance (I) of the strips of material or sheets of material and parallel to the strips of material or the plane of conveyance of the sheets of material. Said elements can pivot independently in set positions by means of an actuating device (33). Each element (23) comprises one or several longitudinal bars (25) with a convex cross section in the direction of the strip of material (9) or the sheets of material to be conveyed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/28; B65H 29/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/28 (2006.01); B65H 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/28 (2013.01); B65H 29/58 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1762 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944931A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19809267 A1 19990909; EP 1060118 A1 20001220; EP 1060118 B1 20011010; WO 9944931 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050302

2004-05-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040525

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040318

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020105

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900304 20011115

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT