Global Patent Index - EP 1060139 A1

EP 1060139 A1 2000-12-20 - AUTOMATIC MELT STREAM POSITIONING DEVICE

Title (en)

AUTOMATIC MELT STREAM POSITIONING DEVICE

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCHE SCHMELZSTROM POSITIONIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PLACEMENT AUTOMATIQUE D'UN FLUX DE MATIERE EN FUSION

Publication

EP 1060139 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99904010 A

Priority

  • SI 9900004 W
  • SI 9800053 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942413A1] The invention relates to a device for automatic positioning of the melt stream on the first rotating disk of an apparatus for scattering rock wool into fibers. The device for automatic positioning of the melt stream on the first rotating disk of an apparatus for scattering rock wool into fibers is characterized in that inside the settling chamber (9) a video camera (10) is placed and the melt tank (11) is movable along the Z and X axes by means of two propelling motors (19, 20), the video camera (10) being connected to a digitizer (15) which is a component of the electronic unit (14), this electronic unit (14) also comprising an output controller (16) that is connected, via a distribution board (17), to a relay block (18) by means of which the alarm (21) of the camera (10) and the motors (19, 20) for moving the tank (11) are switched on, while the electronic circuit (14) with the digitizer (15) and the output controller (16) is realized by means of a computer. The device for automatic positioning of the melt stream on the first rotating disk of an apparatus for scattering rock wool into fibers provides automatic, fast, precise and optimum positioning of the melt stream on the first rotating disk of the apparatus for scattering rock wool into fibers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03B 37/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03B 37/05 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

G05D 3/00 (2006.01); C03C 13/00 (2006.01); G01B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03B 37/055 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942413A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942413 A1 19990826; AT 257463 T 20040115; CZ 20002860 A3 20001213; CZ 298431 B6 20071003; EP 1060139 A1 20001220; EP 1060139 B1 20040107; ES 2214007 T3 20040901; HR P20000489 A2 20010430; HR P20000489 B1 20041231; HU 0100864 A2 20010730; HU 0100864 A3 20030828; HU 223887 B1 20050329; PL 190194 B1 20051130; PL 342599 A1 20010618; SI 9800053 A 19990831; SI 9800053 B 20070228; SK 12692000 A3 20010409; SK 284437 B6 20050401

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2214007 T3

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010116

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR