Global patent index - EP 1060189 A1

EP 1060189 A1 2000-12-20 - DERIVATIVES OF GLYCOPEPTIDE ANTIBACTERIAL AGENTS

Title (en)

DERIVATIVES OF GLYCOPEPTIDE ANTIBACTERIAL AGENTS

Title (de)

GLYCOPEPTID-DERIVATE ALS ANTIBAKTERIELLE MITTEL

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX AGENTS ANTIBACTERIENS

Publication

EP 1060189 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99934285 A

Priority

  • US 9903850 W
  • US 7551498 P
  • US 7890398 P
  • US 8220998 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942476A1] Novel antibacterial agents that act as multibinding agents are disclosed. The compounds of the invention comprise from 2-10 ligands covalently connected, each of said ligands being capable of binding to a transglycosylase enzyme substrate thereby modulating the biological processes/functions thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 7/50; A61K 38/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 9/008 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942476A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942476 A1 19990826; AR 019817 A1 20020320; AU 3307399 A 19990906; CA 2318394 A1 19990826; EP 1060189 A1 20001220; FR 2778184 A1 19991105; IT 1307018 B1 20011023; IT TO990134 A1 19990820

INPADOC legal status

2007-07-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070116

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060905

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THERAVANCE, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-02-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHON, QI-QI

2002-02-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GRIFFIN, JOHN, H.

2002-02-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JENKINS, THOMAS, E.

2002-02-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JUDICE, J., KEVIN

2002-02-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LINSELL, MARTIN, S.

2002-02-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YONGQI MU

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000914;LT PAYMENT 20000914;LV PAYMENT 20000914;MK PAYMENT 20000914;RO PAYMENT 20000914;SI PAYMENT 20000914