Global Patent Index - EP 1060220 A1

EP 1060220 A1 2000-12-20 - DEACIDIFICATION TREATMENT OF PRINTED CELLULOSIC MATERIALS

Title (en)

DEACIDIFICATION TREATMENT OF PRINTED CELLULOSIC MATERIALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ENTSÄUERUNG VON BEDRUCKTEM, CELLULOSEHALTIGEM MATERIAL

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT DE DESACIDIFICATION DE MATIERES CELLULOSIQUES IMPRIMEES

Publication

EP 1060220 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99901377 A

Priority

  • US 9900434 W
  • US 7110398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935207A1] A deacidification composition for use in for treating printed cellulosic materials is provided. A method of making the composition and a method of preparing components of the composition also are provided. The composition includes a metal carbonate, an ultra-dry alcohol having a moisture content of less than about 100 ppm and an ultra-dry solvant having a moisture content of less than about 100 ppm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 3/00; B05D 3/00; C09K 15/32; C23C 16/00; C23F 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 7/00 (2006.01); D21H 19/10 (2006.01); D21H 25/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 25/18 (2013.01); B41M 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935207 A1 19990715; AT 245685 T 20030815; BR 9906824 A 20001017; CA 2317564 A1 19990715; DE 69909762 D1 20030828; DE 69909762 T2 20040415; EP 1060220 A1 20001220; EP 1060220 A4 20010801; EP 1060220 B1 20030723; ES 2201660 T3 20040316; JP 2002500289 A 20020108

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-27 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2005-10-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-10-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-08-03 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-08-03 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20050317

2005-01-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050108

2004-10-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-08-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CONSERVACION DE SUSTRATOS CELULOSICOS S.L.

2004-06-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CONSERVACION DE SUSTRATOS CELULOSICOS S.L.

- Effective date: 20040423

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201660 T3

2004-02-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040202

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-02 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040202

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040131

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040108

2004-01-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040108

2003-12-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-11-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-10-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909762 P 20030828

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020211

2001-08-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE