Global Patent Index - EP 1060243 A1

EP 1060243 A1 2000-12-20 - EMBRYONIC OR STEM-LIKE CELL LINES PRODUCED BY CROSS-SPECIES NUCLEAR TRANSPLANTATION

Title (en)

EMBRYONIC OR STEM-LIKE CELL LINES PRODUCED BY CROSS-SPECIES NUCLEAR TRANSPLANTATION

Title (de)

EMBRYONISCHE ZELLLINIEN ODER STAMMZELL-ÄHNLICHE ZELLLINIEN, DIE DURCH KERNTRANSPLANTATION ZWISCHEN VERSCHIEDENEN SPEZIES PRODUZIERT WURDEN

Title (fr)

LIGNEES CELLULAIRES EMBRYONNAIRES OU DE TYPE SOUCHE PRODUITES PAR TRANSPLANTATION NUCLEAIRE D'ESPECES CROISEES

Publication

EP 1060243 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99911062 A

Priority

  • US 9904608 W
  • US 3294598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945100A1] An improved method of nuclear transfer involving the transplantation of differentiated donor cell nuclei into enucleated oocytes of a species different from the donor cell is provided. The resultant nuclear transfer units are useful for the production of isogenic embryonic stem cells, in particular human isogenic embryonic or stem cells. These embryonic or stem-like cells are useful for producing desired differentiated cells and for introduction, removal or modification, of desired genes, e.g., at specific sites of the genome of such cells by homologous recombination. These cells, which may contain a heterologous gene, are especially useful in cell transplantation therapies and for in vitro study of cell differentiation. Also, methods for improving nuclear transfer efficiency by genetically altering donor cells to inhibit apoptosis, select for a specific cell cycle and/or enhance embryonic growth and development are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01K 67/027; C12N 5/16; C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/873 (2010.01); A61K 35/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/873 (2013.01); A01K 2217/075 (2013.01); A61K 35/12 (2013.01); C12N 2510/00 (2013.01); C12N 2517/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945100 A1 19990910; AU 2979599 A 19990920; AU 759322 B2 20030410; BR 9908499 A 20011226; CA 2323094 A1 19990910; CN 1299408 A 20010613; EP 1060243 A1 20001220; EP 1060243 A4 20050309; IL 138201 D0 20011031; JP 2002505100 A 20020219; NZ 506808 A 20031219

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091001

2006-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROBL, JAMES

2006-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CIBELLI, JOSE

2006-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STICE, STEVEN, L.

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROBL, JAMES

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CIBELLI, JOSE

2006-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STICE, STEVEN, L.

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050606

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050606

2005-03-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01K 67/027 A

2004-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/00 B

2004-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/16 B

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROBL, JAMES

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CIBELLI, JOSE

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STICE, STEVEN, L.

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE