Global Patent Index - EP 1060250 A1

EP 1060250 A1 2000-12-20 - MODIFICATION OF FATTY ACID METABOLISM IN PLANTS

Title (en)

MODIFICATION OF FATTY ACID METABOLISM IN PLANTS

Title (de)

VERÄNDERUNG DES FETTSÄURESTOFFWECHSELS IN PFLANZEN

Title (fr)

MODIFICATION DU METABOLISME DES ACIDES GRAS DANS DES PLANTES

Publication

EP 1060250 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912316 A

Priority

  • US 9904999 W
  • US 7710798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945122A1] Methods and systems to modify fatty acid biosynthesis and oxidation in plants to make new polymers are provided. Two enzymes are essential: a hydratase such as D-specific enoyl-CoA hydratase, for example, the hydratase obtained from Aeromonas caviae, and a beta -oxidation enzyme system. Some plants have a beta -oxidation enzyme system which is sufficient to modify polymer synthesis when the plants are engineered to express the hydratase. Examples demonstrate production of polymer by expression of these enzymes in transgenic plants. Examples also demonstrate that modifications in fatty acid biosynthesis can be used to alter plant phenotypes, decreasing or eliminating seed production and increasing green plant biomass, as well as producing polyhydroxyalkanoates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/52; A01H 5/00; C12N 15/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/52 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8289 (2013.01); C12N 15/52 (2013.01); C12N 15/8243 (2013.01); C12N 15/8247 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945122A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945122 A1 19990910; AU 3071499 A 19990920; AU 750057 B2 20020711; CA 2322729 A1 19990910; CA 2322729 C 20100615; EP 1060250 A1 20001220; JP 2002505107 A 20020219; JP 2009291204 A 20091217; MX PA00008674 A 20030714

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121002

2007-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041018

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041018

2004-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METABOLIX, INC.

2002-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PEOPLES, OLIVER, P.

2002-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOYNTON, LAURA

2002-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUISMAN, GJALT, W.

2002-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOLONEY, MAURICE

2002-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PATTERSON, NII

2002-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SNELL, KRISTI

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE