Global patent index - EP 1060269 A1

EP 1060269 A1 2000-12-20 - PRODUCTION AND USE OF NORMALIZED DNA LIBRARIES

Title (en)

PRODUCTION AND USE OF NORMALIZED DNA LIBRARIES

Title (de)

PRODUKTION UND VERWENDUNG NORMALISIERTER DNA BIBLIOTHEKEN

Title (fr)

PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION D'ECHANTILLOTHEQUES D'ADN NORMALISEES

Publication

EP 1060269 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99909874 A

Priority

  • US 9904917 W
  • US 3472498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945154A1] Disclosed is a process for forming a normalized genomic DNA library from an environmental sample by (a) isolating a genomic DNA population from the environmental sample; (b) at least one of (i) amplifying the copy number of the DNA population so isolated and (ii) recovering a fraction of the isolated genomic DNA having a desired characteristic; and (c) normalizing the representation of various DNAs within the genomic DNA population so as to form a normalized library of genomic DNA from the environmental sample. Also disclosed is a normalized genomic DNA library formed from an environmental sample by the process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; C07H 21/00; C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/1093 (2013.01); C12N 15/1096 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6811 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945154 A1 19990910; AU 2898199 A 19990920; AU 744699 B2 20020228; CA 2321930 A1 19990910; EP 1060269 A1 20001220; EP 1060269 A4 20041027; JP 2002505121 A 20020219; MX PA00008559 A 20050606

INPADOC legal status

2007-10-12 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1033474

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-10-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20060808

2005-04-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIVERSA CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-10-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040913

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE