Global Patent Index - EP 1060279 A1

EP 1060279 A1 2000-12-20 - IRON ALUMINIDE COMPOSITE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF

Title (en)

IRON ALUMINIDE COMPOSITE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF

Title (de)

EISENALUMINIDKOMPOSIT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITE D'ALUMINURE DE FER ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1060279 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905633 A

Priority

  • US 9902211 W
  • US 1748398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939016A1] An iron aluminide composite including an oxide filler and an additive which improves metallurgical bonding of the oxide filler to the iron aluminide. The composite is useful for structural components, extruded shapes and electrical resistance heating elements. The iron aluminide can include, in weight %, </=1 % Cr, 4-32 % Al, </=2 % Ti, </=2 % Mo, </=1 % Zr, </=1 % C, </=3 % W and </=0.1 % B. The oxide filler can comprise </=40 % aluminum oxide particles and the additive can comprise up to 40 % of one or more refractory carbides such as TiC.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 33/00; B22F 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 33/02 (2006.01); B22F 3/12 (2006.01); B22F 3/23 (2006.01); C22C 1/04 (2006.01); C22C 14/00 (2006.01); C22C 29/00 (2006.01); C22C 32/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 29/005 (2013.01); B22F 3/23 (2013.01); C22C 1/0458 (2013.01); C22C 14/00 (2013.01); C22C 32/00 (2013.01); B22F 2998/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 3/1208 + B22F 3/1035 + B22F 3/23
  2. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 3/1208 + B22F 3/20 + B22F 3/23

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939016 A1 19990805; AU 2575499 A 19990816; BR 9908525 A 20001128; CA 2319507 A1 19990805; CN 1292039 A 20010418; EP 1060279 A1 20001220; EP 1060279 A4 20030212; ID 27488 A 20010412; JP 2002501983 A 20020122; NO 20003836 A 20001002; NO 20003836 D0 20000726

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033155

2003-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030718

2003-02-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 38/06 A

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 1/04 B

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 1/05 B

2001-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHRYSALIS TECHNOLOGIES, INCORPORATED

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000831;LT PAYMENT 20000831;LV PAYMENT 20000831;MK PAYMENT 20000831;RO PAYMENT 20000831;SI PAYMENT 20000831