Global Patent Index - EP 1060282 A1

EP 1060282 A1 2000-12-20 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SLIP LAYER WHICH IS RESISTANT TO CORROSION AND OXIDATION

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SLIP LAYER WHICH IS RESISTANT TO CORROSION AND OXIDATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER KORROSIONS- UND OXIDATIONSBESTÄNDIGEN SCHLICKERSCHICHT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UNE COUCHE DE BARBOTINE RESISTANT A LA CORROSION ET A L'OXYDATION

Publication

EP 1060282 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99911613 A

Priority

  • DE 9900476 W
  • DE 19807636 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942633A1] The invention relates to a method for producing a slip layer which is resistant to corrosion and oxidation comprising the following steps: a) producing a slip material by mixing a binding agent solution with a starting powder containing Al or Cr and with an addition powder containing at least one element from Al, Pt, Pd or Si, whereby the addition powder does not contain Al when using a starting powder that is exclusively comprised of Al; b) depositing the slip material on a component; c) hardening the slip layer at temperatures ranging from room temperature to 450 DEG C, and d) heat treating in order to inwardly diffuse the slip layer into the component at temperatures ranging from 750 DEG C to 1250 DEG C.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 10/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 10/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 10/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942633A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942633 A1 19990826; DE 19807636 C1 19991118; EP 1060282 A1 20001220; EP 1060282 B1 20020410; ES 2175956 T3 20021116; JP 2002504628 A 20020212; US 6440499 B1 20020827

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090910

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100222

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100222

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070222

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080223

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080223

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-11-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-11-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2007-07-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175956 T3

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901188 20020516

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WYDRA, GERHARD

2002-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COSACK, THOMAS

2002-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HINREINER, WOLFGANG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT