Global Patent Index - EP 1060291 A2

EP 1060291 A2 2000-12-20 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CORROSION PROTECTIVE COATING AND A COATING SYSTEM FOR SUBSTRATES MADE OF LIGHT METAL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CORROSION PROTECTIVE COATING AND A COATING SYSTEM FOR SUBSTRATES MADE OF LIGHT METAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KORROSIONSCHÜTZENDEN BESCHICHTUNG UND SCHICHTSYSTEM FÜR SUBSTRATE AUS LEICHTMETALL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN REVETEMENT DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA CORROSION ET SYSTEME EN COUCHES POUR SUBSTRATS EN METAL LEGER

Publication

EP 1060291 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99911717 A

Priority

  • DE 19807823 A
  • EP 9901267 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19807823A1] The invention relates to a method for producing a corrosion protective coating for a substrate made of light metal or of a light metal alloy. According to the invention, a non-electrically conductive first layer (10) is first deposited on the substrate (5), whereby the non-electrically conductive first layer (10) is produced by anodic oxidation of the substrate (5). Later, the non-electrically conductive first layer produced by anodic oxidation is subjected to a redensification. Afterwards, a metallic layer (20) is deposited on the non-electrically conductive first layer (10) without using current. Later, a third layer (30) is deposited on the metallic second layer (20). By using this method, wheel rims and wheel trim, for example, for motor vehicles can be chromed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 28/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 5/06 (2006.01); C23C 18/18 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01); C25D 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 28/345 (2013.01); B05D 5/068 (2013.01); C23C 18/1653 (2013.01); C23C 18/1889 (2013.01); C23C 28/322 (2013.01); C23C 28/347 (2013.01); C25D 11/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943869A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807823 A1 19990909; EP 1060291 A2 20001220; EP 1060291 B1 20011219; JP 2002505379 A 20020219; JP 4567187 B2 20101020; US 6703135 B1 20040309; WO 9943869 A2 19990902; WO 9943869 A3 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130226

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900592

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130226

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120228

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020404

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900592 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010220

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB