Global Patent Index - EP 1060327 A1

EP 1060327 A1 2000-12-20 - INFLOW DETECTION APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR ITS USE

Title (en)

INFLOW DETECTION APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR ITS USE

Title (de)

ZUFLUSSERMITTLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUM DURCHFÜHRUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE DETECTION DE FLUX ENTRANT ET SYSTEME D'UTILISATION ASSOCIE

Publication

EP 1060327 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99911735 A

Priority

  • EP 9901397 W
  • US 7702398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945235A1] There is provided a method for monitoring fluid flow within a region to be measured of a subterranean formation, said method comprising placing at least one source within said subterranean formation; placing at least one sensor within said region to be measured, wherein each said at least one sensor is adjacent to at least one source such that said sensor measures changes to said fluid caused by said source; and providing at least one means for transmitting data from each said at least one sensor to at least one data collection device, said at least one data collection device capable of communicating with an operator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 47/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/10 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/1005 (2013.01); E21B 47/10 (2013.01); E21B 47/101 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945235A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945235 A1 19990910; AU 3031499 A 19990920; AU 747413 B2 20020516; BR 9908571 A 20001121; CA 2321539 A1 19990910; CA 2321539 C 20080212; CN 1289788 C 20061213; CN 1292844 A 20010425; DE 69914462 D1 20040304; DE 69914462 T2 20040701; DK 1060327 T3 20040315; EA 004757 B1 20040826; EA 200000907 A1 20010423; EP 1060327 A1 20001220; EP 1060327 B1 20040128; ID 25807 A 20001109; NO 20004434 A 20000905; NO 20004434 D0 20000905; NO 317705 B1 20041206; NZ 506369 A 20030131; OA 11483 A 20040503

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090304

2010-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-11-09 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070321

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-03-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914462 P 20040304

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB IT NL

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020402

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000815

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB IT NL