Global Patent Index - EP 1060347 A1

EP 1060347 A1 2000-12-20 - INTEGRATED SECURITY SYSTEM FOR SMOKE EXTRACTOR

Title (en)

INTEGRATED SECURITY SYSTEM FOR SMOKE EXTRACTOR

Title (de)

EINGEBAUTE SICHERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR RAUCHABZUG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SECURITE INCORPORE POUR EXTRACTEUR DE FUMEES

Publication

EP 1060347 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99906305 A

Priority

  • FR 9900433 W
  • FR 9802860 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2775759A1] The invention concerns a system to be placed at the outlet of a duct (1) and is equipped with a suction device (6) such as a turbine for generating low pressure in the duct (1), characterised in that it comprises two separate air intakes (7, 8) integrated in the extractor and arranged in locations under low pressure and high pressure respectively relative to atmospheric pressure, said air intakes being connected to a pressure switch, for triggering a security event when the detected differential pressure drops beneath a threshold value, which indicates that the extractor is not functioning properly. The invention is a useful equipment for various premises, in particular industrial or residential.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23L 17/00; F23M 11/00; F24F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23L 17/00 (2006.01); F23M 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23L 17/005 (2013.01); F23M 11/00 (2013.01); F23J 2211/30 (2013.01); F23J 2213/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945324A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2775759 A1 19990910; FR 2775759 B1 20000616; CA 2322703 A1 19990910; EP 1060347 A1 20001220; EP 1060347 B1 20020508; ES 2177242 T3 20021201; PT 1060347 E 20021031; WO 9945324 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070226

2007-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060227

2006-10-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20060828

2006-08-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060828

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060227

2005-01-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-21 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177242 T3

2002-11-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT PT

2002-05-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT PT