Global patent index - EP 1060357 A1

EP 1060357 A1 2000-12-20 - HEAT EXCHANGER PLATE AND PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (en)

HEAT EXCHANGER PLATE AND PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (de)

WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHPLATTE UND PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHER

Title (fr)

PLAQUE D'ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE ET ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE A PLAQUES

Publication

EP 1060357 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99906290 A

Priority

  • FI 9900164 W
  • FI 980501 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945332A1] The invention relates to a plate heat exchanger plate (1) which contains alternative locations (4, 5) for flow openings, the locations of which can be changed to adjust the ridge angle between the ridges of the corrugations (2) of the adjacent plates (1) in a plate heat exchanger composed of plates (1) in order to improve the heat transfer and flow characteristics. The plates (1) may also be provided with a location (6) for a central hole.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 3/08; B21D 53/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/005 (2013.01); F28D 9/0012 (2013.01); F28F 3/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945332A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945332 A1 19990910; AU 2627799 A 19990920; DE 69936380 D1 20070809; DE 69936380 T2 20080306; DK 1060357 T3 20071015; EP 1060357 A1 20001220; EP 1060357 B1 20070627; ES 2291015 T3 20080216; FI 107353 B 20010713; FI 980501 A0 19980304; FI 980501 A 19990905

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150305

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160426

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150304

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150304

2015-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140326

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080328

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070627

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070627

2008-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2291015

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-10-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2007-10-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69936380

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-08-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2007-06-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030708

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE