Global Patent Index - EP 1060376 A1

EP 1060376 A1 2000-12-20 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING THE AREA OF TECHNICAL ROLLING BODIES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MONITORING THE AREA OF TECHNICAL ROLLING BODIES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERWACHEN DES BEREICHS TECHNISCHER ROLLKÖRPER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SURVEILLER LA ZONE DE CORPS DE ROULEMENT TECHNIQUES

Publication

EP 1060376 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919037 A

Priority

  • DE 9900597 W
  • DE 19809970 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19909640A1] The method uses sensors (2,3) to monitor forces on the road surface (1) to supply electrical energy to an evaluation unit (6). At least one of the sensors in the area of the tyres is charged with electrical energy, and feeds impulses into the road surface. Signals from the sensors are supplied to the control/evaluation unit, to monitor variations in conditions of the tyres. One of the sensors has a radio transmitter for correspondence with the evaluation unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01M 13/04; B61K 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61K 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61K 9/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945356A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909640 A1 19990923; DE 19909640 C2 20010712; AT 273508 T 20040815; EP 1060376 A1 20001220; EP 1060376 B1 20040811; EP 1060376 B8 20041013; US 7084755 B1 20060801; WO 9945282 A2 19990910; WO 9945356 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050111

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NORD KLAUS JURGEN

- Effective date: 20050331

2006-05-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NORD KLAUS JURGEN

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-09-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-04-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-12-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041203

2004-11-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041122

2004-11-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-11-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-09-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910203 P 20040916

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-04-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01M 13/04 A

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 61K 9/08 B

2004-02-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE