Global patent index - EP 1060485 A1

EP 1060485 A1 2000-12-20 - MULTIPLE PARALLEL CONDUCTOR FOR ELECTRICAL MACHINES AND DEVICES

Title (en)

MULTIPLE PARALLEL CONDUCTOR FOR ELECTRICAL MACHINES AND DEVICES

Title (de)

MEHRFACHPARALLELLEITER FÜR ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINEN UND GERÄTE

Title (fr)

CONDUCTEUR MULTIPLE A AMES PARALLELES

Publication

EP 1060485 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99900823 A

Priority

  • AT 9900014 W
  • AT 32898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944209A1] The invention relates to a multiple parallel conductor for an electrical machine, especially for a transformer, and to a method for manufacturing the same. Said conductor comprises a plurality of adjacent insulated partial conductors (2) assembled in a bundle and fitted at least sectionwise with a grid-shaped sheathing (5), i.e. a grid strip, a thread braiding or the like, and a flat protective insulation (4) arranged between the outer surface of the partial conductor bundle and the grid-shaped sheathing (5), said protective insulation covering at least one surface section of the partial conductor bundle and not covering another surface section of the partial conductor bundle. In one of the windings, at least one of the side faces of the sections of the windings of the multiple parallel conductor (1, 7) adjacent to the side faces overlooking each other is fitted with a flat protective insulation (4). This partial protective insulation additionally increases the winding bulk factor by direct contiguous windings of the multiple parallel conductor since no oil channels are produced as a result of spacing thereby lowering costs and considerably reducing the risk of short circuits caused by friction between two winding sections that are directly in contact with each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/323 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944209A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944209 A1 19990902; AT 207652 T 20011115; AT 406923 B 20001025; AT A32898 A 20000215; CA 2320773 A1 19990902; CA 2320773 C 20040803; DE 59900349 D1 20011129; EP 1060485 A1 20001220; EP 1060485 B1 20011024; US 6563413 B1 20030513

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900349

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-29

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT NL

2001-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 207652

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010213

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT NL