Global Patent Index - EP 1060491 A1

EP 1060491 A1 2000-12-20 - ELECTRICAL CONTACT BREAKER SWITCH, INTEGRATED ELECTRICAL CONTACT BREAKER SWITCH, AND ELECTRICAL CONTACT SWITCHING METHOD

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL CONTACT BREAKER SWITCH, INTEGRATED ELECTRICAL CONTACT BREAKER SWITCH, AND ELECTRICAL CONTACT SWITCHING METHOD

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER KONTAKTÖFFNUNGSSCHALTER, INTEGRIERTER ELEKTRISCHER KONTAKTÖFFNUNGSSCHALTER UND SCHALTVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DISJONCTEUR ELECTRIQUE, DISJONCTEUR ELECTRIQUE INTEGRE, ET PROCEDE DE SECTIONNEMENT ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1060491 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99967613 A

Priority

  • JP 37718398 A
  • US 9930873 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 29/28; H01H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 29/02 (2006.01); H01H 1/00 (2006.01); H01H 29/28 (2006.01); H01H 61/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/0036 (2013.01); H01H 29/28 (2013.01); H01H 61/02 (2013.01); H01H 2029/008 (2013.01); H01H 2061/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0041198A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 69903272 T2 20030703; EP 1060491 A1 20001220; EP 1060491 B1 20021002

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091223

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69903272

- Effective date: 20110701

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081211

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-11 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

- Free text: RESTORATION ALLOWED

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-30 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-22 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071223

2003-10-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-07-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903272 20021107

2002-10-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010207

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE