Global Patent Index - EP 1060600 A1

EP 1060600 A1 2000-12-20 - GMSK encoder for radio frequency transmitter

Title (en)

GMSK encoder for radio frequency transmitter

Title (de)

GMSK Kodierer für Funksender

Title (fr)

Encodeur de type GMSK pour un émetteur radiofréquence

Publication

EP 1060600 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914471 A

Priority

  • EP 9901401 W
  • GB 9804602 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2335122A] A transmitter encoder for the transmission of GMSK signals is provided, comprising: a digital data source (1), a first filter unit (2) with a low-pass characteristic and an integrator (3), all connected in series; a sine component extractor (4) for calculating the sine component of the output of the integrator, the sine component extractor being connected to a second low-pass filter (6); a cosine component extractor (5) for calculating the cosine component of the output of the integrator, the cosine component extractor being connected to a third low-pass filter (7); whereby the output of the integrator is supplied to both the sine- and cosine component extractors. The second (6) and third (7) low-pass filters can be Finite Impulse Response filters. In a portable or mobile radio or telephone, the filters' co-efficients can be set to provide >60dB attenuation of those signals which leak into transmission channels adjacent to the channel on which the radio or telephone is transmitting. The arrangement is suitable for digital radios which operate with a 6.25 kHz channel width.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 27/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/2017 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945681A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2335122 A 19990908; GB 9804602 D0 19980429; EP 1060600 A1 20001220; WO 9945681 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-07-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GMSK ENCODER FOR RADIO FREQUENCY TRANSMITTER

2004-07-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GMSK ENCODER FOR RADIO FREQUENCY TRANSMITTER

2004-06-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GMSK ENCODER FOR RADIO FREQUENCY TRANSMITTER

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010730

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT SE