Global Patent Index - EP 1060678 A2

EP 1060678 A2 2000-12-20 - Brassiere with shaping inserts

Title (en)

Brassiere with shaping inserts

Title (de)

Büstenhalter mit Versteifungsbügeln

Title (fr)

Soutien-gorge à armatures

Publication

EP 1060678 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109934 A

Priority

DE 29909775 U

Abstract (en)

The pocket (23) consists of sections of a tunnel tape and is connected in an areal fashion to the bra material. The tape is connected to the bra through an adhesion and/or melt process. The underside of the tunnel tape is equipped with an adhesive activated through the application of heat or warmth.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Büstenhalter (1) aus zwei die Büstenkörbchen (4, 5) enthaltenden Seitenteilen (2, 3) ist entlang der unteren Ränder der Körbchen (4, 5) jeweils eine Tasche (23) zur Aufnahme eines U-förmigen Versteifungsbügels (24) angeordnet. Die Tasche (23) besteht aus einem Abschnitt eines Tunnelbandes (25), der im Wege eines Klebe- und/oder Verschmelzungsvorganges im wesentlichen flächig mit dem Material des Büstenhalters (1) verbunden ist. Dadurch wird erreicht, dass die die Versteifungsbügel (24) aufnehmenden Taschen (23) nach entsprechender Vorbereitung allein durch rechtwinklig zur Werkstückebene wirkende Arbeitsvorgänge gegebenenfalls mit gleichzeitiger Erwärmung unter Verzicht auf Nähvorgänge mit dem Material des Büstenhalters verbunden werden können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41C 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41C 3/0007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29909775 U1 20001012; EP 1060678 A2 20001220; EP 1060678 A3 20011010; HU 0002148 A2 20010928; HU 0002148 D0 20000828; HU 221907 B1 20030228; PL 190308 B1 20051130; PL 340531 A1 20001218

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-21 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032339

2003-05-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-02-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI