Global Patent Index - EP 1060681 A2

EP 1060681 A2 2000-12-20 - Business-shoe

Title (en)

Business-shoe

Title (de)

Business-Schuh

Title (fr)

Chaussure d'affaires

Publication

EP 1060681 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109874 A

Priority

DE 29910684 U

Abstract (en)

The shoe comprises: (a) middle sole (1) is formed as a kind of foot bed according to the foot anatomy, and has an oval cutout in the heel region; (b) joint reinforcement (2) is constituted as a half-sole which surrounds the rear and middle regions of the foot, and is made of a thermo-plastically formable, stabilizing material; (c) spring layer (4) of the heel consists of a closed-cell foam material with approximately 30 % damping; and (d) cutout in the middle sole and the joint reinforcement are filled with a layer (16) foamed polyethylene terephthalate with practically 100 % shape recovery capability.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Business-Schuh, dessen Brandsohle (1) nach Art eines Fußbetts der Anatomie des Fußes entsprechend geformt und im Fersenbereich oval ausgeschnitten ist. Des weiteren ist eine Gelenkverstärkung (2) vorgesehen, die als Halbsohle ausgebildet ist, den Rück- und Mittelfußbereich umfasst und aus einem thermoplastisch verformbaren, stabilisierenden Material besteht. Der Ausschnitt in der Brandsohle (1) ist mit einer Schicht (16) aus geschäumtem Polyethylenterephthalat (PPT) mit praktisch hundertprozentiger Rückstellfähigkeit ausgefüllt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 3/10; A43B 13/18; A43B 13/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/144 (2013.01); A43B 7/1445 (2013.01); A43B 13/40 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910684 U1 19990812; EP 1060681 A2 20001220; EP 1060681 A3 20020814

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030215

2003-06-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 43B 3/10 A, 7A 43B 13/18 B, 7A 43B 13/40 B, 7A 43B 21/26 B

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MUELLER, NICOLE

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI