Global Patent Index - EP 1060683 A2

EP 1060683 A2 2000-12-20 - Storage device fixed to a wall

Title (en)

Storage device fixed to a wall

Title (de)

Wandablagevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rangement fixé au mur

Publication

EP 1060683 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111703 A

Priority

DE 19927588 A

Abstract (en)

The wall mounted umbrella stand component comprises a base plate (11), a holder (13) and a fixing unit (15). A hooked surface (17) on the base plate engages with a cooperating surface (33) on the holder. A second set of cooperating surfaces lock the components together when the fixing unit is attached.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Wandablagevorrichtung, insbesondere Schirmspitzenaufnahme, zur Befestigung an einer Wand und zur Ablage von Gegenständen, mit einer an der Wand befestigbaren Sockeleinheit, einer an der Sockeleinheit montierbaren Halteeinheit und einer zumindest an der Halteeinheit montierbaren Fixiereinheit, wobei die Sockeleinheit und die Halteeinheit jeweils wenigstens ein Einhakelement und wenigstens ein Rastelement besitzen, wobei ferner unter Zusammenwirken jeweils der Einhakelemente miteinander und der Rastelemente miteinander die Halteeinheit an der Sockeleinheit einhakbar und verrastbar ist, und wobei der Rastschluß zwischen den Rastelementen der Sockeleinheit und der Halteeinheit durch Montage der Fixiereinheit an der Halteeinheit gegen ein unbeabsichtigtes Lösen sicherbar ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45B 25/28; A47G 25/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/02 (2006.01); A47G 25/12 (2006.01); A47K 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/027 (2013.01); A47G 25/12 (2013.01); A47K 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060683 A2 20001220; EP 1060683 A3 20020116; DE 19927588 A1 20001221

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-11-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 45B 25/28 A, 7A 47G 25/12 B, 7A 47B 96/02 B, 7A 47K 1/08 B

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI