Global Patent Index - EP 1060691 A1

EP 1060691 A1 2000-12-20 - Sink unit with sub-distribution board

Title (en)

Sink unit with sub-distribution board

Title (de)

Spülbeckenschrank mit einer Stromunterverteilungsplatte

Title (fr)

Placard pour évier avec un tableau de sous-distribution

Publication

EP 1060691 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00202117 A

Priority

NL 1012371 A

Abstract (en)

Sink unit provided with a sub-distribution board which contains connection means for connecting the sub-distribution board to a group in a central distribution board and connection means for connecting electrical appliances. The sub-distribution board is accommodated in a housing. By means of fixing means, the housing of the sub-distribution board is accommodated at the front of the sink unit and at least partially in the space between the front of the sink unit and the sink. With this arrangement the distance between the rear and the front of at least part of the housing is less than the distance from the sink to the front of the sink unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 77/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/06 (2013.01); A47B 2220/03 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

NL 1007455 A

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060691 A1 20001220; EP 1060691 B1 20031112; NL 1012371 C2 20001219

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2009-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EATON ELECTRIC N.V.

- Effective date: 20090630

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-06-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *EATON ELECTRIC N.V.EUROPALAAN 202, NL-7559 SC HEN

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-06-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *EATON ELECTRIC N.V.EUROPALAAN 202, NL-7559 SC HEN

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-06-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040616

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE LU NL

2003-05-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE LU NL

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010618

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE LU NL

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI