Global Patent Index - EP 1060692 A1

EP 1060692 A1 2000-12-20 - Fitting for vertical drawer frame

Title (en)

Fitting for vertical drawer frame

Title (de)

Beschlag für Ausziehrahmen bei Hochschränken

Title (fr)

Ferrure pour cadre à tiroirs verticaux

Publication

EP 1060692 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112275 A

Priority

AT 106999 A

Abstract (en)

The mounting for an extending frame (7) in a wardrobe (2) comprises a bar (14) which is at right angles to the end upright of the frame (5). This allows a front panel (12) to be attached to the frame. Bolts (13) fitted to the ends of the bar fit into holes in the panel. A plug on the other side of the bar which passes through a threaded sleeve in the bar allows the bolts to be tightened.

Abstract (de)

Ein Beschlag für Ausziehrahmen (7) bei Hochschränken (2), wobei der Ausziehrahmen (7) vertikal stehend auf einer Ausziehführung (3) festgelegt ist und die Ebene des Ausziehrahmens (7) parallel zur Ausziehrichtung der Ausziehführung (3) steht und der Ausziehrahmen (7) aus vertikalen und horizontalen Rahmenschenkeln besteht und am vorderen vertikalen Rahmenschenkel (5) mittels des daran angeordneten Beschlages eine Frontblende (12) befestigbar ist, wird aus einem quer zum Rahmenschenkel (5) angeordneten Holm (14) gebildet. Der Holm (14) weist an seiner dem Ausziehrahmen (7) abgewandten Seite Dübelzapfen (13) auf, die zur Aufnahme in zu ihren Abmessungen korrespondierenden Bohrungen in der Frontblende (12) vorgesehen sind, wobei der gegenseitige Abstand (N) der Dübelzapfen (13) veränderbar ist. Mindestens ein Dübelzapfen (13) besitzt einen koaxial liegenden Gewindezapfen (16), wobei dieser Gewindezapfen (16) von einem Muttergewinde (19, 20) im Holm (14) aufgenommen ist und der gegenüber dem Holm (14) nach hinten gerichtete Teil des Gewindezapfens (16) eine dessen Verdrehung mittels eines Werkzeuges oder von Hand ermöglichende Ausformung aufweist. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/04; A47B 88/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/00 (2006.01); A47B 88/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/42 (2017.01); A47B 88/956 (2017.01); A47B 2088/421 (2017.01); A47B 2088/422 (2017.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060692 A1 20001220; AT 411132 B 20031027; AT A106999 A 20030315

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060103

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021223

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI