Global Patent Index - EP 1060699 A2

EP 1060699 A2 2000-12-20 - Clothing hanger with a hook at the arm ends

Title (en)

Clothing hanger with a hook at the arm ends

Title (de)

Kleiderbügel mit Haken an den Bügelenden

Title (fr)

Cintre pourvu d'un crochet aux extrémités des bras

Publication

EP 1060699 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110676 A

Priority

DE 29910260 U

Abstract (en)

The clothes hanger has a main body (1) and hook element (2), is made of a U-profile that is open at the bottom and has horizontally-positioned hooks (8) at the upper side of the arms (3,4) to hold lightweight garments. Additional hook shapes (9-12) are cut into the front wall (5) of the U-shaped profile at both outer ends. The outer hooks are invisible from the back and have back walls behind the cut out areas.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Kleiderbügel mit einem Bügelkörper (1) aus Kunststoff, in dessen mittlerem, oberem Bereich eine Aufhängevorrichtung (2) angeordnet ist und der zwei sich beiderseits der Aufhängevorrichtung (2) erstreckende Bügelarme (3,4) umfaßt, welche aus einem nach unten offenen, vorzugsweise U-förmigen Hohlprofil bestehen, wobei an dem freien, äußeren Endbereich jedes Bügelarms (3,4) mindestens ein Haken zur Aufnahme einer Aufhängeschlaufe eines Bekleidungsstückes angeordnet ist, Aufgabe der vorliegenden Erfindung ist es, einen einfach und kostengünstig herzustellenden Kleiderbügel zu schaffen, bei dem die Gefahr des Abbrechens des Hakens im Endbereich der Bügelarme sowie die Gefahr des unbeabsichtigten Verhakens mit einer Textilware reduziert ist. Diese Aufgabe wird dadurch gelöst, daß der Haken durch einen Durchbruch (9) in nur einer (5) der beiden einander gegenüberliegenden Wandungen (5,6) des nach unten offenen Hohlprofils ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/28; A47G 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/28 (2006.01); A47G 25/48 (2006.01); A47G 25/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/50 (2013.01); A47G 25/28 (2013.01); A47G 25/486 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910260 U1 20000113; AT 390873 T 20080415; EP 1060699 A2 20001220; EP 1060699 A3 20050119; EP 1060699 B1 20080402

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50015071

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080519

2009-03-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090106

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-05-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015071 P 20080515

2008-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2005-10-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2005-08-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47G 25/28 A

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47G 25/14 B

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI