Global Patent Index - EP 1060738 A2

EP 1060738 A2 2000-12-20 - Self-tanning composition comprising carmine and caramel

Title (en)

Self-tanning composition comprising carmine and caramel

Title (de)

Karmin und Karamel enthaltende selbstbräunende Zusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition autobronzonte contenant du carmin et du caramel

Publication

EP 1060738 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305038 A

Priority

US 33344699 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a composition comprising self-tanning agent and carmine, cosmetic products comprising such composition and a cosmetically acceptable carrier, and methods of using such products.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61K 8/98 (2006.01); A61Q 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 19/04 (2013.01); A61K 8/60 (2013.01); A61K 8/987 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1060738 A2 20001220; EP 1060738 A3 20021120; EP 1060738 B1 20051109; CA 2311696 A1 20001215; CA 2311696 C 20051018; DE 60023792 D1 20051215; DE 60023792 T2 20060803; US 6214322 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-05-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140103

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130614

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60023792

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-27 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20060400405

- Effective date: 20140103

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130614

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120619

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120607

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060400405

2006-02-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060220

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60023792 P 20051215

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR

2005-11-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-06-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SELF-TANNING COMPOSITION COMPRISING CARMINE AND CARAMEL

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030429

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI